By Christine L. Compston

ISBN-10: 0195166124

ISBN-13: 9780195166125

ISBN-10: 1423775228

ISBN-13: 9781423775225

This lecturers' consultant is designed to accompany Oxford's Pages from heritage sequence and starts with the belief that the scholars who should be utilizing one of many volumes within the sequence have had very little event operating with fundamental assets. as well as taking a look at things like what a major resource is and the result of instructing with them, this teacher's consultant additionally comprises pattern classes.

**Read or Download A Teacher's Guide to Using Primary Sources (Pages from History) PDF**

**Best education & reference books**

**Download e-book for iPad: The Knight Waits at Night (Homophones) by Mary Elizabeth Salzmann**

Photos and straightforward textual content introduce homophones, phrases that sound alike yet are spelled another way and feature diversified meanings.

**Read e-book online Beyond the Code Book 1: Comprehension and Reasoning Skills PDF**

Comprehension and Reasoning talents

- What Is Inside the Lincoln Memorial?
- Ben & Jerry. Ice Cream Manufacturers
- Basic Engineering Mathematics
- Scary Jobs (Way Out Work)
- School

**Extra resources for A Teacher's Guide to Using Primary Sources (Pages from History)**

**Example text**

Odd numbers end with the digits 1, 3, 5, 7, or 9. Prime number a number that only has two factors: 1 and itself. Product the result of multiplying two numbers. In the equation 3 × 5 = 15, 15 is the product. Remainder when you have divided a whole number into another whole number, what is left over is called the remainder. Units the last digit in a whole number. For example, in 513 the unit is 3. Volume a measurement of how much a threedimensional shape could contain, measured in units cubed: for example, cubic feet.

4 0 0 6 2 3 4 8 3 2 2 0 8 9 0 0 6 2 4 5 1 has been carried over to the next column. 0+6+2+1=9 Now you try it! 324 x 5 18 x 92 Answers: 26 × 14 = 364. 324 × 5 = 1,620. 18 × 92 = 1,656. 26 x 14 4 8 3 2 2 8 2 8 + 3 + 4 = 15, so write 5 and add 1 to the next diagonal column. 34 × 28 = 952 59 Long division No calculators allowed! Division is something that we use all the time, and you won’t always have a calculator around. So it’s worth learning how to divide large numbers with just a pen and paper.

Some people find this easier than standard long multiplication. Say, for example, you want to multiply 45 by 6. The number 6 is only one digit long, so only one row of boxes is needed. A) The number 45 has two digits, so draw two rectangular boxes side by side. B) Draw a diagonal line across each box from the bottom left-hand corner to the top right-hand corner. C) Write the numbers you want to multiply along the top and right-hand side of the boxes. A) B) C) 5 4 6 D) Multiply the digits along the top and side, starting from the right.

### A Teacher's Guide to Using Primary Sources (Pages from History) by Christine L. Compston

by Ronald

4.4